HONDA SIEL POWER PRODUCTS LIMITED
HONDA SIEL POWER PRODUCTS LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 19/09/1985. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Delhi office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 150000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 101430710.0/-. It is engaged in Electricity, Gas & Water companiesHONDA SIEL POWER PRODUCTS LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is L40103DL2004PLC203950 and its registration number is 203950. Its registered address is 409, DLF TOWER B JASOLA COMMERCIAL COMPLEX NEW DELHI DL 110025 IN- Delhi - INDIA
HONDA SIEL POWER PRODUCTS LIMITED has been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of HONDA SIEL POWER PRODUCTS LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: HONDA SIEL POWER PRODUCTS LIMITED
- Company CIN: L40103DL2004PLC203950
- Incorporation Date: 19/09/1985
- Registrar Office: RoC-Delhi
- Registration Number: 203950
- State: Delhi
- Address: 409, DLF TOWER B JASOLA COMMERCIAL COMPLEX NEW DELHI DL 110025 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 150000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 101430710.0 /-
- Listing Status: Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Electricity, Gas & Water companies
Generation and transmission of electricity: hydro-electric power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: coal based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: oil-based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: atomic reactor power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: other power plants using conventional fuels (e.g. gas based)
Generation of solar energy
Generation and distribution of bio-gas energy
Generation of electricity from other non-conventional sources.
Collection and distribution of electric energy to households, industrial, commercial and other users.
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00001982 DHARAM VIR KAPUR 31/03/1988 - 00017410 RAVI VIRA GUPTA 25/03/2005 - 00027750 SIDDHARTH SHRIRAM 19/09/1985 - 00114067 ALKA MAREZBAN BHARUCHA 15/09/2014 - 00844279 MANOJ ARORA 01/03/2014 - 05242535 VINAY MITTAL 01/04/2012 - 06848213 HIROYOSHI SUGIMIZU 01/04/2014 - 07136925 YOSHIFUMI IIDA 01/04/2015 - AAAPM4656N VINAY MITTAL 01/04/2017 - AFFPG6765E SUNITA GANJOO 03/11/2014 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 650000000.0 07/11/1988 24/12/2013 CLOSED