ADVENTZ INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS LIMITED
ADVENTZ INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 10/06/1985. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Kolkata office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 55000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 54633240.0/-. It is engaged in TradingADVENTZ INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is L51226WB1985PLC039055 and its registration number is 039055. Its registered address is HONGKONG HOUS31 B B D BAGH (S) P S HARE STREET KOLKATA WB 700001 IN- West Bengal - INDIA
ADVENTZ INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS LIMITED has been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of ADVENTZ INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS LIMITED is - Amalgamated
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: ADVENTZ INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS LIMITED
- Company CIN: L51226WB1985PLC039055
- Incorporation Date: 10/06/1985
- Registrar Office: RoC-Kolkata
- Registration Number: 039055
- State: West Bengal
- Address: HONGKONG HOUS31 B B D BAGH (S) P S HARE STREET KOLKATA WB 700001 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 55000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 54633240.0 /-
- Listing Status: Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Amalgamated
- Company Business Activities:
Trading
Wholesale of fruits & vegetables
Wholesale of raw milk & dairy products
Wholesale of meat, fish & eggs.
Wholesale of confectionery, bakery products and beverages other than intoxicants.
Wholesale of edible oils, fats, sugar and processed/manufactured spices etc.
Wholesale of tea, coffee & cocoa.
Wholesale of manufactured tobacco & tobacco products.
Wholesale of intoxicants like wines and liquors.
Wholesale of other basic/manufactured food stuffs.
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00008654 SAROJ KUMAR PODDAR 18/12/1995 - 00008686 AKSHAY PODDAR 12/12/2000 - 00053824 SANTOSH KUMAR RUNGTA 12/12/2000 - 00055736 JYOTSNA PODDAR 26/06/1997 - 00170811 RAMESH MAHESHWARI 27/03/2004 - 01365548 SATYA NARAYAN KHAITAN 30/04/2005 - CEWPS8136M Sweta Saxena 14/08/2012 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status