PANCHAM AQUACULTURE FARMS LIMITED
PANCHAM AQUACULTURE FARMS LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 28/10/1987. It is categorised as Company limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Mumbai office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 30000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 29800000.0/-. It is engaged in Manufacturing (Food stuffs)PANCHAM AQUACULTURE FARMS LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U15140MH1987PLC045127 and its registration number is 045127. Its registered address is 103 B WING MITTAL TOWER NARIMAN POINT MUMBAI MH 400021 IN- Maharashtra - INDIA
PANCHAM AQUACULTURE FARMS LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of PANCHAM AQUACULTURE FARMS LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: PANCHAM AQUACULTURE FARMS LIMITED
- Company CIN: U15140MH1987PLC045127
- Incorporation Date: 28/10/1987
- Registrar Office: RoC-Mumbai
- Registration Number: 045127
- State: Maharashtra
- Address: 103 B WING MITTAL TOWER NARIMAN POINT MUMBAI MH 400021 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 30000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 29800000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Manufacturing (Food stuffs)
Manufacture of hydrogenated oils and vanaspati ghee etc.
Manufacture of vegetable oils and fats (excluding corn oil)
Manufacture of vegetable oils and fats through solvent extraction process
Manufacture of animal oils and fats (Rendering and refining of lard and other animal fats are classified in Class 1511]
Manufacture of fish oil
Manufacture of cakes & meals incl. residual products, e.g. Oleostearin, Palmstearin
Manufacture of non-defatted flour or meals of oilseeds, oilnuts or kernels
Manufacture of other vegetables and animal oil & fats
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00268915 PUNDLIK RAMDAS KOLHE 20/03/2004 - 01249854 DINKAR PANDURANG BAVISKAR 20/03/2004 - 01715679 CHITRA VASANT RAUT 25/03/2006 - 02377216 CHANDRAKANT VISHRAM NAIK 30/09/2008 - 03159863 VIJAY SAKHARAM KULKARNI 16/02/2010 - 06569108 SHIVAJI VITHAL PATIL 01/01/2013 - 06957783 SANJAY SHAMKANT DEGAONKAR 30/06/2015 - 06966630 VRUSHALI DHANANJAY AGASHE 15/06/2017 - 07304214 HARSHAD VIJAY SWAR 19/03/2016 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 5000000.0 03/09/2002 - OPEN Book debts; Movable property (not being pledge) 33000000.0 20/03/2000 05/01/2017 OPEN Immovable property or any interest therein 12000000.0 22/03/2000 - OPEN Immovable property or any interest therein 19700000.0 01/07/1992 - OPEN Movable property (not being pledge) 1172000.0 21/12/2017 - OPEN Movable property (not being pledge) 1200000.0 15/05/2017 - OPEN Movable property (not being pledge) 769000.0 01/06/2017 - OPEN