SARVESHWAR ORGANIC FOODS LIMITED
SARVESHWAR ORGANIC FOODS LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 03/08/2004. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Jammu office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 300000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 181000000.0/-. It is engaged in Manufacturing (Food stuffs)SARVESHWAR ORGANIC FOODS LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U15312JK2004PLC002444 and its registration number is 002444. Its registered address is SARVESHWAR HOUSEBELOW GUMAT JAMMU JAMMU AND KASHMIR JK 180001 IN- Jammu and Kashmir - INDIA
SARVESHWAR ORGANIC FOODS LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of SARVESHWAR ORGANIC FOODS LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: SARVESHWAR ORGANIC FOODS LIMITED
- Company CIN: U15312JK2004PLC002444
- Incorporation Date: 03/08/2004
- Registrar Office: RoC-Jammu
- Registration Number: 002444
- State: Jammu and Kashmir
- Address: SARVESHWAR HOUSEBELOW GUMAT JAMMU JAMMU AND KASHMIR JK 180001 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 300000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 181000000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Manufacturing (Food stuffs)
Flour milling
Rice milling
Dal milling
Processing and grinding of grain other than floor, rice & dal
Vegetable milling, flour or meal of dried leguminous vegetables of roots or tubers or of edible nuts
Manufacture of breakfast foods obtained by roasting or swelling cereal grains
Manufacture of prepared, blended flour, wet flour for food preparation and dough for bread, cake, etc.
Manufacture of other readymade mixed powders like idli, gulabjamun etc.
Other grain milling and processing activities like manufacturing of poha/ muri etc,
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 02715232 ROHIT GUPTA 03/08/2004 - 07417422 GAYATRI TANDON 28/01/2016 - 07417538 ANIL KUMAR 28/01/2016 - 07465316 THYAGARAJAN KUMARAN 11/05/2017 - 07818713 TEJ PARTAP 11/05/2017 - 07874555 JAGDISH LAL SHARMA 10/07/2017 - ADZPK0526D RAJESH KURUP 13/10/2017 - AINPS1008B DEEPAK SINGHVI 01/03/2017 - CDBPK7059P PRABHDEEP KOUR 01/06/2017 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 664100000.0 18/01/2013 - CLOSED Book debts; Movable property (not being pledge) 250000000.0 29/01/2014 - OPEN Immovable property or any interest therein; Book debts; Movable property (not being pledge) 610000000.0 03/01/2013 - CLOSED Immovable property or any interest therein; Book debts; Movable property (not being pledge) 750000000.0 24/01/2014 30/05/2017 OPEN Immovable property or any interest therein; Book debts; Movable property (not being pledge); Stocks 1308000000.0 24/01/2014 20/02/2017 OPEN