POWERLINKS TRANSMISSION LIMITED
POWERLINKS TRANSMISSION LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 04/05/2001. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Delhi office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 4836000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 4680000000.0/-. It is engaged in Electricity, Gas & Water companiesPOWERLINKS TRANSMISSION LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U40105DL2001PLC110714 and its registration number is 110714. Its registered address is 10TH FLOOR, DLF TOWER-A DISTRICT CENTER -JASOLA NEW DELHI DL 110025 IN- Delhi - INDIA
POWERLINKS TRANSMISSION LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of POWERLINKS TRANSMISSION LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: POWERLINKS TRANSMISSION LIMITED
- Company CIN: U40105DL2001PLC110714
- Incorporation Date: 04/05/2001
- Registrar Office: RoC-Delhi
- Registration Number: 110714
- State: Delhi
- Address: 10TH FLOOR, DLF TOWER-A DISTRICT CENTER -JASOLA NEW DELHI DL 110025 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 4836000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 4680000000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Electricity, Gas & Water companies
Generation and transmission of electricity: hydro-electric power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: coal based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: oil-based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: atomic reactor power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: other power plants using conventional fuels (e.g. gas based)
Generation of solar energy
Generation and distribution of bio-gas energy
Generation of electricity from other non-conventional sources.
Collection and distribution of electric energy to households, industrial, commercial and other users.
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00015615 INDU SHEKHAR JHA 27/10/2009 - 00466631 AJAY KAPOOR 20/03/2013 - 02626778 SANJEEV MEHRA 31/01/2012 - 05169220 RITA SINHA 30/03/2015 - 05181372 DIPTIVILASA DEVANA KONDA 08/10/2015 - 07071993 NOVEL SINGHAL LAVASA 02/05/2017 - 07085449 JAYANT TIKU 21/09/2015 - 07359191 SRIRAMCHANDRA MURTY KOCHERLAKOTA 14/01/2016 - AAEPT3420H JAYANT TIKU 01/02/2015 - AKYPM6065F MONICA MEHRA 01/06/2013 - ANBPB0637J GAJENDRA BHARDWAJ 01/08/2015 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 9800000000.0 14/04/2004 - OPEN Goodwill; Book debts; Trademark; Movable property (not being pledge); All agreements, insurance policies etc. 11282500000.0 14/04/2004 01/10/2015 OPEN Immovable property or any interest therein 11282500000.0 18/04/2007 01/10/2015 OPEN