SBEC BIOENERGY LIMITED
SBEC BIOENERGY LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 18/04/1996. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Kanpur office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 350000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 230000000.0/-. It is engaged in Electricity, Gas & Water companiesSBEC BIOENERGY LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U40105UP1996PLC037250 and its registration number is 037250. Its registered address is VILLAGE LOYAN MALAKPUR TEHSIL BARAUT UP 250611 IN- Uttar Pradesh - INDIA
SBEC BIOENERGY LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of SBEC BIOENERGY LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: SBEC BIOENERGY LIMITED
- Company CIN: U40105UP1996PLC037250
- Incorporation Date: 18/04/1996
- Registrar Office: RoC-Kanpur
- Registration Number: 037250
- State: Uttar Pradesh
- Address: VILLAGE LOYAN MALAKPUR TEHSIL BARAUT UP 250611 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 350000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 230000000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Electricity, Gas & Water companies
Generation and transmission of electricity: hydro-electric power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: coal based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: oil-based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: atomic reactor power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: other power plants using conventional fuels (e.g. gas based)
Generation of solar energy
Generation and distribution of bio-gas energy
Generation of electricity from other non-conventional sources.
Collection and distribution of electric energy to households, industrial, commercial and other users.
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00002757 UMESH KUMAR MODI 24/07/1997 - 00002798 ABHISHEK MODI 11/07/2011 - 00003817 JAGAN NATH KHURANA 17/06/1996 - 00004606 VIJAY KUMAR MODI 25/09/2006 - 00004840 SHIV SHANKAR AGARWAL 07/04/1998 - 00298252 RAJEEV KUMAR AGARWAL 13/03/2015 - 02849637 JAYESH MODI 13/05/2010 - 05316202 JAGDISH CHANDER CHAWLA 13/03/2015 - ANEPG5541M AJAY KUMAR GUPTA 13/03/2015 - AQXPN3153A NITISH NAUTIYAL 17/04/2017 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 350000000.0 29/12/2010 17/08/2011 CLOSED Book debts; Movable property (not being pledge) 150000000.0 29/06/2010 - CLOSED Immovable property or any interest therein; Book debts; Floating charge; Movable property (not being pledge) 200000000.0 13/02/2014 - OPEN Immovable property or any interest therein; Book debts; Movable property (not being pledge) 120000000.0 27/02/2007 - CLOSED Immovable property or any interest therein; Movable property (not being pledge) 120000000.0 21/08/2007 - OPEN Immovable property or any interest therein; Movable property (not being pledge) 140000000.0 02/09/1997 - CLOSED Immovable property or any interest therein; SECOND CHARGE ON ALL IMMOVABLE PROPERTIES. 360000000.0 11/02/2017 - OPEN Movable property (not being pledge) 100000000.0 02/09/2010 - CLOSED Movable property (not being pledge) 30000000.0 12/11/2008 - OPEN