RAYS SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED
RAYS SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED is a Private limited company incorporated on 22/06/2010. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Jaipur office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 100000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 100000.0/-. It is engaged in Electricity, Gas & Water companiesRAYS SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U40106RJ2010PTC032173 and its registration number is 032173. Its registered address is D-43, JANPATH SHYAM NAGAR JAIPUR RJ 302019 IN- Rajasthan - INDIA
RAYS SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of RAYS SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: RAYS SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED
- Company CIN: U40106RJ2010PTC032173
- Incorporation Date: 22/06/2010
- Registrar Office: RoC-Jaipur
- Registration Number: 032173
- State: Rajasthan
- Address: D-43, JANPATH SHYAM NAGAR JAIPUR RJ 302019 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Private Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 100000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 100000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Electricity, Gas & Water companies
Generation and transmission of electricity: hydro-electric power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: coal based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: oil-based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: atomic reactor power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: other power plants using conventional fuels (e.g. gas based)
Generation of solar energy
Generation and distribution of bio-gas energy
Generation of electricity from other non-conventional sources.
Collection and distribution of electric energy to households, industrial, commercial and other users.
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 01573387 SHIV PRAKASH MATHUR 30/07/2015 - 06556905 JOHN MARTIN THOMAS 25/04/2017 - 06995884 SUBHASH CHAND 03/05/2017 - 07252527 LALIT KUMAR MEHTA 30/07/2015 - 07703200 ABHISHEK SHIVAM 25/01/2017 - 07796795 ANJALI CHAUHAN 03/05/2017 - 07796806 RAKESH CHAUHAN 03/05/2017 - 07796807 ABHISHEK RAJKUMAR SHARMA 03/05/2017 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status