M.P.WINDFARMS LIMITED
M.P.WINDFARMS LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 20/10/1994. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Gwalior office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 10000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 7000000.0/-. It is engaged in Electricity, Gas & Water companiesM.P.WINDFARMS LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U40107MP1994PLC008737 and its registration number is 008737. Its registered address is "Energy Tower", 64, B-Sector Kasturba Nagar, Near Chetak Bridge, Bhopal MP 462023 IN- Madhya Pradesh - INDIA
M.P.WINDFARMS LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of M.P.WINDFARMS LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: M.P.WINDFARMS LIMITED
- Company CIN: U40107MP1994PLC008737
- Incorporation Date: 20/10/1994
- Registrar Office: RoC-Gwalior
- Registration Number: 008737
- State: Madhya Pradesh
- Address: "Energy Tower", 64, B-Sector Kasturba Nagar, Near Chetak Bridge, Bhopal MP 462023 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 10000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 7000000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Electricity, Gas & Water companies
Generation and transmission of electricity: hydro-electric power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: coal based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: oil-based thermal power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: atomic reactor power plants
Generation and transmission of electricity: other power plants using conventional fuels (e.g. gas based)
Generation of solar energy
Generation and distribution of bio-gas energy
Generation of electricity from other non-conventional sources.
Collection and distribution of electric energy to households, industrial, commercial and other users.
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00102241 RAJAN DEB 20/10/1994 - 00102486 MANAN KUMAR DEB 01/04/2007 - 01106495 GHANSHYAM DAS AGRAWAL 20/10/1994 - 01363763 MANU SRIVASTAVA 18/06/2015 - 02494120 KAMALESH CHANDRA LAHIRY 22/09/2009 - 06627334 AMITABH AWASTHI 29/06/2013 - 07184292 ABHILAKH SINGH 18/06/2015 - 07772219 DEVENDRA PALSINGH DHAKED 25/03/2017 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 272049.0 24/04/2002 - CLOSED 365000.0 22/07/2004 - CLOSED 700000.0 01/09/1999 22/07/2004 CLOSED 7178000.0 04/03/1998 - CLOSED Book debts 200000.0 22/07/2004 - CLOSED Book debts 500000.0 01/09/1999 22/07/2004 CLOSED Movable property (not being pledge) 245000.0 08/12/2007 - CLOSED Movable property (not being pledge) 335000.0 06/01/2009 - CLOSED Movable property (not being pledge) 6560000.0 26/03/1996 03/02/1997 CLOSED