DLF BRANDS LIMITED
DLF BRANDS LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 10/03/2006. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Delhi office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 4461300000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 3266800000.0/-. It is engaged in ConstructionDLF BRANDS LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U45201DL2006PLC147368 and its registration number is 147368. Its registered address is 204, GROUND/F/F OKHLA INDL ESTATE PH-III NEW DELHI NEW DELHI South Delhi DL 110020 IN- Delhi - INDIA
DLF BRANDS LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of DLF BRANDS LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: DLF BRANDS LIMITED
- Company CIN: U45201DL2006PLC147368
- Incorporation Date: 10/03/2006
- Registrar Office: RoC-Delhi
- Registration Number: 147368
- State: Delhi
- Address: 204, GROUND/F/F OKHLA INDL ESTATE PH-III NEW DELHI NEW DELHI South Delhi DL 110020 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 4461300000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 3266800000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Construction
General construction (including alteration, addition, repair and maintenance) of residential buildings, carried –out on own-account basis or on a fee or contract basis.
General construction (including alteration, addition, repair and maintenance) of non-residential buildings, carried –out on own-account basis or on a fee or contract basis.
Construction and maintenance of roads, rail-beds, bridges, tunnels, pipelines, rope-ways, ports, harbours and runways etc.
Construction/erection and maintenance of power, telecommunication and transmission lines
Construction and maintenance of waterways and water reservoirs
Construction and maintenance of hydro-electric projects
Construction and maintenance of power plants, other than hydro-electric power plants
Construction and maintenance of industrial plants other than power plants
Construction including special trade construction
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00003371 SUNIL KUMAR PANDEY 10/03/2006 - 00003395 LOVEKUSH SHARMA 10/03/2006 - 00006651 MAYANK SINGHAL 01/01/2016 - 00067233 PIA SINGH 06/03/2009 - 01039973 DHIRAJ SARNA 30/09/2011 - 02432920 UMANG BEDI 01/01/2016 - 07310866 SANDEEP AGARWAL 29/03/2016 - AAEPR9517P ASHISH RASTOGI 01/04/2014 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 600000000.0 05/01/2010 10/03/2012 OPEN 600000000.0 16/06/2010 10/03/2012 OPEN 600000000.0 23/08/2010 10/03/2012 OPEN 963700000.0 29/10/2011 24/05/2015 OPEN