ASHOKA CONCESSIONS LIMITED
ASHOKA CONCESSIONS LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 05/04/2011. It is categorised as Company limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Mumbai office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 180000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 10000000.0/-. It is engaged in ConstructionASHOKA CONCESSIONS LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U45201MH2011PLC215760 and its registration number is 215760. Its registered address is S. No. 113/2, 5th Floor, Ashoka Business Enclave, Wadala Road, Nashik Nashik MH 422009 IN- Maharashtra - INDIA
ASHOKA CONCESSIONS LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of ASHOKA CONCESSIONS LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: ASHOKA CONCESSIONS LIMITED
- Company CIN: U45201MH2011PLC215760
- Incorporation Date: 05/04/2011
- Registrar Office: RoC-Mumbai
- Registration Number: 215760
- State: Maharashtra
- Address: S. No. 113/2, 5th Floor, Ashoka Business Enclave, Wadala Road, Nashik Nashik MH 422009 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 180000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 10000000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Construction
General construction (including alteration, addition, repair and maintenance) of residential buildings, carried –out on own-account basis or on a fee or contract basis.
General construction (including alteration, addition, repair and maintenance) of non-residential buildings, carried –out on own-account basis or on a fee or contract basis.
Construction and maintenance of roads, rail-beds, bridges, tunnels, pipelines, rope-ways, ports, harbours and runways etc.
Construction/erection and maintenance of power, telecommunication and transmission lines
Construction and maintenance of waterways and water reservoirs
Construction and maintenance of hydro-electric projects
Construction and maintenance of power plants, other than hydro-electric power plants
Construction and maintenance of industrial plants other than power plants
Construction including special trade construction
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00037069 RAJENDRACHAND SINGHVI 31/03/2015 - 00101534 GYAN CHAND DAGA 30/04/2014 - 00108866 SHARADCHANDRA DAMODAR ABHYANKAR 31/03/2015 - 00112324 SATISH DHONDULAL PARAKH 05/04/2011 - 00580763 ASHISH ASHOK KATARIYA 05/04/2011 - 02721580 SURESH KRISHAN GOYAL 07/01/2013 - 03474498 PARESH CHATURSINHA MEHTA 12/03/2012 - 07276497 NANDINI ROSARIO RODRICKS 28/09/2015 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 17460000000.0 03/11/2014 01/06/2015 OPEN 3290000000.0 03/03/2015 - OPEN 6173100000.0 16/01/2015 01/02/2016 CLOSED Pledge of Equity shares held in Borrower Company 4050000000.0 07/05/2015 13/12/2016 OPEN Pledge of Equity shares held in Borrower Company 4507926238.0 08/09/2017 - OPEN Pledge of Equity Shares held in Borrower Company. 4150000000.0 28/09/2017 - OPEN Pledge of Equity shares held in Borrower company. 5823600000.0 18/03/2016 - OPEN Pledge of Equity Shares held in Borrower Company. 6000000000.0 19/01/2017 03/10/2017 OPEN