RELIANCE COMMERCIAL LAND & INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED
RELIANCE COMMERCIAL LAND & INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 04/08/2008. It is categorised as Company limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Mumbai office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 1241000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 530100000.0/-. It is engaged in TradingRELIANCE COMMERCIAL LAND & INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U51109MH2008PLC185389 and its registration number is 185389. Its registered address is 4th Floor, Court House Lokmanya Tilak Marg, Dhobi Talao Mumbai MH 400002 IN- Maharashtra - INDIA
RELIANCE COMMERCIAL LAND & INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of RELIANCE COMMERCIAL LAND & INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED is - Amalgamated
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: RELIANCE COMMERCIAL LAND & INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED
- Company CIN: U51109MH2008PLC185389
- Incorporation Date: 04/08/2008
- Registrar Office: RoC-Mumbai
- Registration Number: 185389
- State: Maharashtra
- Address: 4th Floor, Court House Lokmanya Tilak Marg, Dhobi Talao Mumbai MH 400002 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
- Company Category: Company limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 1241000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 530100000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Amalgamated
- Company Business Activities:
Trading
Commission agents dealing in agricultural raw material, live animals, food, beverages, intoxicants and textiles.
Commission agents dealing in wood, paper, skin, leather and fur, fuel, petroleum products, chemicals, perfumery and cosmetics, glass, minerals, ores and metals.
Commission agents dealing in machinery & equipment, other than transport machinery.
Commission agents ( Commission agents working in emerging area like e-commerce are classified under 7290)
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00006401 SRINIVASAN RAMESH 30/03/2009 - 00006481 ASHWIN AHAMENDRA KHASGIWALA 04/08/2008 - 00012666 CHANDRAKANT SHRIPAD GOKHALE 27/03/2015 - 00047360 RAJKUMAR NARAYANDAS PUGALIA 03/02/2015 - 06670563 BALASUBRMANIAN CHANDRASEKARAN 27/03/2015 - ABQPV6072N SANJEEV VIJAYVARGIA 15/04/2015 - AHEPT4831D RADHIKA SHANKAR THORAT 13/10/2016 - ECKPS0237P HARSHIT ANIL SHAH 30/09/2014 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status Movable property (not being pledge) 5000000.0 30/03/2009 - CLOSED