ASSAM FOOD AND CIVIL SUPPLIES CORPORATION LIMITED
ASSAM FOOD AND CIVIL SUPPLIES CORPORATION LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 23/09/2014. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as State Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Shillong office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 3000000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 121883900.0/-. It is engaged in TradingASSAM FOOD AND CIVIL SUPPLIES CORPORATION LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U51229AS2014SGC011948 and its registration number is 011948. Its registered address is DIRECTORATE OF FOOD,CIVIL SUPPLIES&CONSUMER AFFAIR SETHI TRUST BUILDING, BHANGAGARH GUWAHATI Kamrup AS 781005 IN- Assam - INDIA
ASSAM FOOD AND CIVIL SUPPLIES CORPORATION LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of ASSAM FOOD AND CIVIL SUPPLIES CORPORATION LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: ASSAM FOOD AND CIVIL SUPPLIES CORPORATION LIMITED
- Company CIN: U51229AS2014SGC011948
- Incorporation Date: 23/09/2014
- Registrar Office: RoC-Shillong
- Registration Number: 011948
- State: Assam
- Address: DIRECTORATE OF FOOD,CIVIL SUPPLIES&CONSUMER AFFAIR SETHI TRUST BUILDING, BHANGAGARH GUWAHATI Kamrup AS 781005 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: State Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 3000000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 121883900.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Trading
Wholesale of fruits & vegetables
Wholesale of raw milk & dairy products
Wholesale of meat, fish & eggs.
Wholesale of confectionery, bakery products and beverages other than intoxicants.
Wholesale of edible oils, fats, sugar and processed/manufactured spices etc.
Wholesale of tea, coffee & cocoa.
Wholesale of manufactured tobacco & tobacco products.
Wholesale of intoxicants like wines and liquors.
Wholesale of other basic/manufactured food stuffs.
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 01761277 RAJESH PRASAD 08/12/2014 - 06915118 JOHN BERCHMANS EKKA 23/09/2014 - 07125837 VAZHUVELIL BHASKARAN NAIR PYARELAL 26/05/2015 - 07260194 AMLAN BARUAH 07/05/2015 - 07299267 ROSHAN ARA BEGUM 28/12/2015 - 07491467 SIMANTA THAKURIA 13/04/2016 - 07575546 RIHON DAIMARI 25/07/2016 - 07650011 SAJEEDA ISLAM RASHID 08/11/2016 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status