OMNIBUS INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF DAMAN DIU AND DADRA NAGAR HAVELI LIMITED
OMNIBUS INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF DAMAN DIU AND DADRA NAGAR HAVELI LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 27/03/1992. It is categorised as Company Limited by Shares and classified as State Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Goa office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 500000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 260655700.0/-. It is engaged in FinanceOMNIBUS INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF DAMAN DIU AND DADRA NAGAR HAVELI LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U65923DD1992SGC001221 and its registration number is 001221. Its registered address is NEAR SECRETRIATFORT MOTI DAMAN NANI DAMAN DAMAN Daman DD 396210 IN- Daman and Diu - INDIA
OMNIBUS INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF DAMAN DIU AND DADRA NAGAR HAVELI LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of OMNIBUS INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF DAMAN DIU AND DADRA NAGAR HAVELI LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: OMNIBUS INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF DAMAN DIU AND DADRA NAGAR HAVELI LIMITED
- Company CIN: U65923DD1992SGC001221
- Incorporation Date: 27/03/1992
- Registrar Office: RoC-Goa
- Registration Number: 001221
- State: Daman and Diu
- Address: NEAR SECRETRIATFORT MOTI DAMAN NANI DAMAN DAMAN Daman DD 396210 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: State Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 500000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 260655700.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Finance
Activities of hire - purchase financing
Activities of housing finance companies. (Granting of credit for house purchase by specialised institutions that do not also take deposits is included here)
Activities of commercial loan companies. (included are the activities of the company which is carrying on as its principal business providing of loans or advances or otherwise for any activity other than its own)
Activities through credit cards
Other credit activities including pawn shops (Un-incorporated financial institutions in class 6599).
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00021163 VISHAMBER TEKCHAND SHEWAKRAMANI 13/06/2013 - 00088953 AJAY AGARWAL 14/06/2016 - 00386239 GOPAL KALYAN TANDEL 04/06/1997 - 02116206 AJEET UDAIVIRSINGH YADAV 18/06/2014 - 03473064 RAMESH KUNDNANI 27/09/2017 - 03564914 SHRINIVAS SHIVACHARAN VAISHYA 14/06/2016 - 03640744 DEEPAK KUMAR SUBBIAH BALRAJ 10/08/2017 - 06416750 YATIN KESHAV FUGRO 25/11/2011 - 06571479 SAJJAN SINGH YADAV 09/03/2017 - 06976832 KIRIT PAREKH CHIMANLAL 18/06/2014 - 07488901 ALLA VENKATA DHARMA REDDY 05/11/2015 - 07652308 PRAFULBHAI KHODIDAS PATEL 23/08/2016 - 07804772 POOJA JAIN 17/07/2017 - AALPB8858N YATENDRA BHARGAVA 26/11/2001 - AZCPP0824E CHARMIE KAMALKUMAR PAREKH 25/10/2016 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status 6000000.0 05/12/1994 - OPEN