SEWRI LAND COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED
SEWRI LAND COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED is a Private limited company incorporated on 19/04/1934. It is categorised as Company limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Mumbai office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 5000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 4968090.0/-. It is engaged in Real Estate and RentingSEWRI LAND COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U70101MH1934PTC002097 and its registration number is 002097. Its registered address is 401, LANDMARK, 4TH FLOOR, 554, DR. G. M. BHOSALE MARG, WORLI, MUMBAI MH 400018 IN- Maharashtra - INDIA
SEWRI LAND COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of SEWRI LAND COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: SEWRI LAND COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED
- Company CIN: U70101MH1934PTC002097
- Incorporation Date: 19/04/1934
- Registrar Office: RoC-Mumbai
- Registration Number: 002097
- State: Maharashtra
- Address: 401, LANDMARK, 4TH FLOOR, 554, DR. G. M. BHOSALE MARG, WORLI, MUMBAI MH 400018 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Private Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 5000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 4968090.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Real Estate and Renting
Purchase, sale letting of leased residential buildings
Purchase, sale letting of leased non-residential buildings
Operating of real estate of self owned residential buildings
Operating of real estate of self owned non-residential buildings
Developing and subdividing real estate into lots
Lessors of real property
Real estate activities with own or leased property
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00155599 UDAYAN KARSANDAS THAKKER 28/10/1973 - 00156053 NARESH JAYANTILAL SHAH 08/09/2000 - 00156093 SANJAY KARSANDAS THAKKER 20/06/1988 - 00156141 SHANTIBEN KARSANDAS THAKKER 25/11/1992 - 00156210 RAJUL UDAYAN THAKKER 29/09/2015 - 00156237 AMI SANJAY THAKKER 29/09/2015 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status