GARWARE INDUSTRIES LIMITED
GARWARE INDUSTRIES LIMITED is a Public limited company incorporated on 21/09/1989. It is categorised as Company limited by Shares and classified as Indian Non-Government Company. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Mumbai office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 120000000.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 110000000.0/-. It is engaged in Business ServicesGARWARE INDUSTRIES LIMITED's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U74999MH1989PLC053573 and its registration number is 053573. Its registered address is AURANGABAD PUNE ROAD WALUJ AURANGABAD MH 431133 IN- Maharashtra - INDIA
GARWARE INDUSTRIES LIMITED has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of GARWARE INDUSTRIES LIMITED is - Amalgamated
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: GARWARE INDUSTRIES LIMITED
- Company CIN: U74999MH1989PLC053573
- Incorporation Date: 21/09/1989
- Registrar Office: RoC-Mumbai
- Registration Number: 053573
- State: Maharashtra
- Address: AURANGABAD PUNE ROAD WALUJ AURANGABAD MH 431133 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
- Company Category: Company limited by Shares
- Company Sub category: Indian Non-Government Company
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 120000000.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 110000000.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Amalgamated
- Company Business Activities:
Business Services
Auctioning activities of self employed auctioneers.
Business brokerage activities, i.e. arranging for the purchase and sale of small and medium-sized businesses. Also included are appraisal activities other than for real estate and insurance
Photostat, blue-printing, Xeroxing, copying of documents, ammonia printing and cyclostyling services
Fashion design related to textiles, wearing apparel, shoes, jewelry, furniture and other fashion goods.
Services rendered by liaison offices
Interior decoration
Secretarial activities such as telephone answering, stenographic, duplicating & mailing etc.
Other business activities
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00049287 TUSHAR MADHUVANDAS PARIKH 20/01/1999 - 00135862 SHEELA SHASHIKANT GARWARE 05/12/1998 - 00135995 SONIA GARWARE 05/12/1998 - 00136048 SARITA GARWARE RAMSAY 05/12/1998 - 00137190 ANIL BALWANTRAO BHALERAO 09/08/2002 - 00143400 MONIKA RAJIV GARWARE MODI 05/12/1998 - 00146752 MOHAN SITARAM ADSUL 03/10/2001 - 00265223 ASHOK MADHUKAR DESHPANDE 16/07/1990 - 00601668 CHANDRASHEKHAR JAIWANTRAO PATHAK 04/12/2009 - 00943822 SHASHIKANT BHALCHANDRA GARWARE 05/12/1998 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status