COUNCIL FOR LEATHER EXPORTS
COUNCIL FOR LEATHER EXPORTS is a Public limited company incorporated on 26/06/1984. It is categorised as Company Limited by Guarantee and classified as Company licensed under Section25. It is registered at Registrar of Companies, RoC-Chennai office. Its authorized share capital is Rs. 0.0 /- and paid up capital is Rs. 0.0/-. It is engaged in Community, personal & Social ServicesCOUNCIL FOR LEATHER EXPORTS's Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U93090TN1984NPL010934 and its registration number is 010934. Its registered address is CMDA, TOWER II, III FLOOR2, GANDHI IRWIN ROAD EGMORE, CHENNAI 600008 TAMILNADU TN 600008 IN- Tamil Nadu - INDIA
COUNCIL FOR LEATHER EXPORTS has not been Listed with stock exchanges
Current status of COUNCIL FOR LEATHER EXPORTS is - Active
COMPANY FACTS
- Company Name: COUNCIL FOR LEATHER EXPORTS
- Company CIN: U93090TN1984NPL010934
- Incorporation Date: 26/06/1984
- Registrar Office: RoC-Chennai
- Registration Number: 010934
- State: Tamil Nadu
- Address: CMDA, TOWER II, III FLOOR2, GANDHI IRWIN ROAD EGMORE, CHENNAI 600008 TAMILNADU TN 600008 IN
- Telephone Number:
- Website :
-
Update Website, Products & Services
- Company Category: Company Limited by Guarantee
- Company Sub category: Company licensed under Section25
- Company Class: Public Limited Company
- Authorised Capital (INR): 0.0 /-
- Paid Up Capital (INR): 0.0 /-
- Listing Status: Not Listed with stock exchanges
- Company Status: Active
- Company Business Activities:
Community, personal & Social Services
Social activities such as marriage bureaus
Pet care services such as boarding, grooming and training pets etc.
Shoe shiners, porters, valet car parkers etc.
Coin-operated personal service machines such as photo booths, weighing machines, blood pressure checking machines etc.
Activities of sauna and steam baths, massage salons etc.
Astrological and spiritualists’ activities
Activities of aaya, dhai, governess, baby sitter etc.
General household maintenance activities like grooming of the floor, dusting, cleaning of utensils etc.
DIRECTORS
-
DIN Director Name Appointment Date Resignation Date 00012108 MUKHTARUL AMIN 10/01/2007 - 00013749 RAFEEQUE AHMED MECCA 18/12/2010 - 00018665 HUSSAIN HABIB MIRZA ALTAF 10/01/2007 - 00111734 RAFEEQ AHMED THADEY 13/02/2007 - 00171379 MALACK ABDUL WAHAB 18/12/2010 - 00400760 ASHRAF RIZWAN 18/12/2010 - 00640494 MUHAMAD DHALA YAVAR 18/12/2010 - 00650959 SANJAY LEEKHA 18/12/2010 - 01335862 JAVED IQBAL 18/12/2010 - 01861519 PURAN CHAND DAWAR 18/12/2010 - 02674948 RAJENDRA KUMAR JALAN 18/12/2010 -
Charges / Borrowing Details
-
Assets Borrowing Amount Creation Date Modification Date Current Status