ABHISHEK MODI
-
About ABHISHEK MODI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15421UP1991PLC019160 SBEC SUGAR LIMITED 476538800.0 Active 13/05/1994 - L27106JH1982PLC001633 BIHAR SPONGE IRON LIMITED 902054030.0 Active 14/02/2001 - U15400DL2009PTC191424 MODI ILLVA INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 391500000.0 Active 19/06/2009 - U20297UP2008PTC034600 MODI ARTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/11/2008 - U40105UP1996PLC037250 SBEC BIOENERGY LIMITED 230000000.0 Active 11/07/2011 - U51101DL2008PTC184860 MODI GOODS AND RETAIL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/11/2008 - U51109DL1983PLC015250 MODI HITECH INDIA LIMITED 40500000.0 Active 05/09/1997 - U51397DL1981PTC011647 WIN-MEDICARE PRIVATE LIMITED 9687650.0 Active 11/03/1994 - U63040DL1996PTC076223 MODILINE TRAVEL SERVICE PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 28/06/1996 - U67120UP1980PTC004957 LONGWELL INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 19/09/1994 - U74899DL1951GAP001947 PHD CHAMBER OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY 0.0 Active 23/12/2011 - U74899DL1987PTC028294 A TO Z HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 01/03/1996 - U74899DL1990PTC041928 MODI-MUNDIPHARMA PRIVATE LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 15/02/1995 - -
Associated with Directors