ASHISH BHASIN
-
About ASHISH BHASIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22210MH2009PTC193474 VIZEUM MEDIA SERVICES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 1100000.0 Active 22/06/2009 - U45400DL2007PTC163788 SVG MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 266513.0 Active 18/04/2017 - U72200MH1999PTC118111 IPROSPECT INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 21184190.0 Active 09/08/2012 - U72200PN2009PTC145012 SOKRATI TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1133202.0 Active 28/07/2017 - U72400MH2008PTC178016 WAT MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/01/2015 - U72900MH2000PTC125585 ULTIMEDIA E-SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 11161000.0 Active 09/08/2012 - U74120MH2009PTC196973 FOUNTAINHEAD ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 830300.0 Active 16/10/2015 - U74140DL2012FTC231042 DENTSU MEDIA AND HOLDINGS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 355500000.0 Active 03/06/2015 - U74300KA2008PTC048022 HAPPY CREATIVE SERVICES (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/10/2016 - U74300MH1986PTC039002 POSTERSCOPE OUTDOOR ADVERTISING PRIVATE LIMITED 9900000.0 Active 13/06/2008 - U74300MH1996PTC104701 CARAT MEDIA SERVICES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 247479450.0 Active 13/06/2008 - U74300MH2003PTC141869 DENTSU INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 59293680.0 Active 26/10/2015 - U74300MH2003PTC143297 DENTSU ONE PRIVATE LIMITED 237836610.0 Active 26/10/2015 - U74300MH2005PTC157300 DENTSU IMPACT PRIVATE LIMITED 44910710.0 Active 22/09/2015 - U74899DL1994PTC057593 PERFECT RELATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 4806900.0 Active 17/09/2016 - U74899DL2000PTC107294 DENTSU WEBCHUTNEY PRIVATE LIMITED 3288660.0 Active 28/09/2015 - U74900MH2008PTC186174 DENTSU AEGIS NETWORK INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 132022040.0 Active 26/08/2008 - U74990MH2009PTC194843 MILESTONE BRANDCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 894000.0 Active 25/07/2014 - U74999MH2011PTC213907 FRACTAL INK DESIGN STUDIO PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 20/12/2016 - U74999MH2011PTC217524 TAPROOT DENTSU INDIA COMMUNICATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/09/2015 - U99999MH1994NPL076530 MEDIA RESEARCH USERS COUNCIL 0.0 Active 13/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors