AIYUSH BHUWALKA
-
About AIYUSH BHUWALKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100MH2004PTC146821 INDO STAINLESS TUBES PRIVATE LIMITED 2160000.0 Amalgamated 08/06/2004 - U27107KA2002PTC030403 BHUWALKA PIPES PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 23/04/2002 - U29120MH1993PLC074220 UB STAINLESS LIMITED 42500000.0 Active 30/09/2005 - U29253MH2014PTC257436 UB EQUIPMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 21/08/2014 - U45200MH1989PTC050344 DHAROD CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 3452800.0 Active 29/08/2001 - U67120MH1991PTC062142 PADMINI HOLDINGS PVT LTD 1030000.0 Amalgamated 22/08/2008 - U67120MH1995PTC091824 WEST COAST HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 2103000.0 Amalgamated 29/08/2001 - -
Associated with Directors
SUSHIL BHUWALKA Director HARSHVARDHAN BHUWALKA Director VANDANA UBEROI Director