AMBRISH RAMKRISHNA HARIVALLABHDAS
-
About AMBRISH RAMKRISHNA HARIVALLABHDAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100GJ1987PTC009995 AJA METALS AND TUBES PRIVATE LIMITED 125000.0 Active 07/07/2000 - U51900MH1946PLC005110 ECHKE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/02/2000 - U51909GJ1940PTC000337 ESSENAR INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1462500.0 Active 03/05/2010 - U51909GJ1987PTC009981 AKJAY MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 125100.0 Active 12/11/1988 - U65910GJ1982PTC005560 SHRI AMODYA INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/08/1988 - U65910GJ1983PTC005897 ANSUMALINI INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/06/2000 - U74999GJ2013PTC074906 AKJAY ENVIRO SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 214230.0 Under Process of Striking Off 07/05/2013 - -
Associated with Directors