ASHWIN CHAMPRAJ SHROFF
-
About ASHWIN CHAMPRAJ SHROFF,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L23205GJ1965PLC001343 TRANSPEK INDUSTRY LIMITED 55855690.0 Active 02/05/1980 - L24200MH1960PLC011807 EXCEL INDUSTRIES LIMITED 62853460.0 Active 01/02/2010 - U01407MH2008NPL181505 DEVELOPMENTAL & ECO-FRIENDLY ENTERPRISES 100000.0 Active 24/04/2008 - U28999GJ1996PTC029188 TRANSPEK-SILOX INDUSTRY PRIVATE LIMITED 120609000.0 Active 18/01/2001 - U65910MH1980PTC022574 UTKARSH GLOBAL HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 2800000.0 Amalgamated 14/11/2014 - U65990MH1983PLC030597 KAMALJYOT INVESTMENTS LIMITED 19998200.0 Active 09/11/1984 - U74140DL2006NPL151114 CENTRE FOR BHARATIYA MANAGEMENT DEVELOPMENT 145000.0 Active 25/08/2006 - -
Associated with Directors