ASKARAN AGARWALA
-
About ASKARAN AGARWALA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24100JH1976PLC001255 ADITYA BIRLA CHEMICALS (INDIA) LIMITED 233865000.0 Amalgamated 09/05/2001 - L24117TN1972PLC006271 TANFAC INDUSTRIES LIMITED 149750000.0 Active 12/11/1980 - L27020MH1958PLC011238 HINDALCO INDUSTRIES LIMITED 2244889146.0 Active 11/09/1998 - U17110MH2000PLC127427 ADITYA BIRLA POWER COMPANY LIMITED 1185000.0 Active 29/03/2002 - U27203WB1938PLC009515 INDIAN ALUMINIUM CO LTD 142514000.0 Amalgamated 27/06/2000 - U74999MH1964PLC012924 UDYOG SERVICES LIMITED 505000.0 Active 12/08/1998 - U85199PN2001PLC019881 ADITYA BIRLA HEALTH SERVICES LIMITED 900500000.0 Active 09/07/2012 - U99999GJ2001PLC062239 ADITYA BIRLA INSURANCE BROKERS LIMITED 27000000.0 Active 08/11/2006 - -
Associated with Directors