AJAY K SINGHAL
-
About AJAY K SINGHAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403DL2008PTC184101 ULTIMATE AGRO FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/10/2008 - U18101DL2005PTC134631 SHRADHANJALI APPARELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/04/2011 - U45400DL2007PTC162237 AURIC INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/04/2011 - U70100DL2008PLC181422 AURIC LIFESPACE DEVELOPERS LIMITED 900000.0 Active 28/07/2008 - U74140DL2003PTC119665 SAA CORPORATE CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/04/2003 - U74899DL1995PTC071918 AURIC INFOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 24/08/1995 - U74899DL1997PTC089060 AURIC EXMARK PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 13/08/1997 - -
Associated with Directors
GIRINDER KUMAR Director ARCHANA SINGHAL Director MANISH KUMAR AGARWAL Director