ASHOK KUMAR SHARMA
-
About ASHOK KUMAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U74899DL1972PTC006391 TOOLS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 09/06/1998 - U74899DL1987PTC028143 ASHVILLE POULTRY FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 22020020.0 Amalgamated 01/06/1998 - U74899DL1989PTC035878 STYLE LEASING AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 23000000.0 Active 09/06/1998 - U74899DL1992PTC047967 NAVDEEP FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 21980000.0 Amalgamated 04/06/1998 - U74899DL1994PTC058756 SPRING MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 32500000.0 Active 08/06/1998 - U74899DL1994PTC058878 FOUR WINGS MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 12500000.0 Active 02/06/1998 - -
Associated with Directors
VED PRAKASH AGARWAL Director VIKRAM AGARWAL Director CHANDRA SINGH RAWAT Director KANHA AGARWAL Director