ASHOKRAJ RAMCHANDRA BIRLA
-
About ASHOKRAJ RAMCHANDRA BIRLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51220MH1995PTC084859 CANDESCENT TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/02/2009 - U51909MH2003PTC138871 VEDANT MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 9200000.0 Active 22/04/2012 - U65920MH1994PTC077781 SARAT LEASING AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 12500000.0 Active 30/03/2012 - U67120MH1993PTC131541 F PUDUMJEE INVESTMENT COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 04/06/2009 - U74140KA2005PTC035878 VERIFACTS SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 04/02/2014 -