AKHIL KUMAR SUREKA
-
About AKHIL KUMAR SUREKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27104HR1970PLC005240 JOTINDRA STEEL AND TUBES LIMITED 48727490.0 Active 01/07/2008 - L65929WB1975PLC029956 QUALITY SYNTHETICS INDUSTRIES LTD. 55000000.0 Active 01/12/2003 - U45201DL2004PTC125754 VL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 01/01/2010 - U70100DL2010PTC202501 AMRAPALI LEISURE VALLEY PRIVATE LIMITED 4673340.0 Active 01/06/2016 03/06/2016 U70101DL2013PTC248288 SARVOME INFRASTRUCTURE PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/02/2013 - U70109DL2013PTC250612 SARVOME DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/04/2013 - U74900DL2011PLC225445 PRUDENT ARC LIMITED 102450000.0 Active 05/10/2011 - -
Associated with Directors