ASHIM SHAKTI SAMANTA
-
About ASHIM SHAKTI SAMANTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24110MH1990PTC057183 ASHISH RANG UDYOG PRIVATE LIMITED 286100.0 Active 15/04/1994 - U24239MH1990PTC055594 SAMANTA ORGANICS PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 28/02/1990 - U51900MH2006PTC160749 NAUTILUS TRADING AND LEASING PRIVATE LIMITED 48650000.0 Active 28/08/2006 - U92100MH1954PLC009244 THE FILM & TELEVISION PRODUCERS GUILD OF INDIA LTD. 0.0 Active 31/05/2016 - U92100MH1968PTC014075 NATRAJ STUDIOS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 03/10/2009 - U92100MH1972PTC016055 SHAKTI CINE STUDIOS PRIVATE LIMITED 110000.0 Active in Progress 09/10/1972 - U92100MH1981PTC024850 SAMANTA MOVIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/07/1981 - -
Associated with Directors