ASHOK GANESHCHANDRA MRIG
-
About ASHOK GANESHCHANDRA MRIG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U28991MH2003PTC143643 VAAV ENGINEERED PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 2193500.0 Amalgamated 24/12/2003 - U29130MH1994PTC077836 EXCEL CONTROLINKAGE PRIVATE LIMITED 2998600.0 Active 20/04/1994 - U29219MH2015PTC260750 MULTIFLEX MARINE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/01/2015 - U29240MH1999PTC146448 G-THREE-M TECHNOLOGIES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 2289000.0 Amalgamated 29/09/2001 - U31900MH1998PTC117226 GMG TECHNOTRADES PRIVATE LIMITED 4208600.0 Active 01/04/2009 - U31908DL2009PTC196042 LUCENT ENERGY COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 127750.0 Active 17/11/2009 -