ASHOK GORDHANDAS SARDA
-
About ASHOK GORDHANDAS SARDA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U52100MH2006PTC160387 KYAL TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/12/2014 - U70101MH2014PTC254617 HEENAL OPERATING LEASE CO. PRIVATE LIMITED 80100000.0 Active 19/03/2014 - U70200MH2007PTC166932 PRECISION REALTY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 250000000.0 Active 13/03/2009 - U71200MH2014PTC255886 CHIRAG OPERATING LEASE CO. PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/07/2014 - U74999MH2006PTC162507 DIVYA BUSINESS CONCEPTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/03/2009 -