ASHOK HARIRAM THAKKAR
-
About ASHOK HARIRAM THAKKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15400GJ1990PLC014265 ADF FOODS LIMITED 212014610.0 Active 26/08/1993 - U15132GJ2009PLC058782 ADF FOODS (INDIA) LIMITED 500000.0 Active 07/12/2009 - U15490MH2007PTC170748 POWER BRANDS (FOODS) PRIVATE LIMITED 208867920.0 Under Liquidation 10/05/2007 - U51101MH1997PTC110823 MISHAL INTERNATIONAL (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 4600000.0 Active 23/09/1997 - U65990MH1989PTC054791 LUSTRE INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 10102000.0 Amalgamated 20/08/2002 - -
Associated with Directors