AJAYKANT RAMPRASAD RUIA
-
About AJAYKANT RAMPRASAD RUIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22300MH2010PTC209976 SHIVHARI FILMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/11/2010 - U24110MH1985PTC037958 AB COLOR PRIVATE LTD 2377100.0 Active 05/11/1985 - U31110MH1988PTC046943 TRAFO ELECTRIC PRIVATE LIMITED 2476400.0 Active 08/04/1988 - U65990MH1984PLC033586 ALL STATE FINANCE AND LEASING LTD 10981740.0 Active 28/07/1984 - U73100MH1970NPL014686 M.VISVESVARAYA INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CENTRE 0.0 Active 27/08/2008 - U74900MH1985PTC035540 ALLSTATE COMSERVE PRIVATE LIMITED 259400.0 Active 05/03/1985 - U91110MH1997NPL107251 FEDERATION OF ACCOMMODATION INDUSTRY OF INDIA 74000.0 Active 16/05/2007 - U91120MH1999GAP117936 INDIAN ASSOCIATION OF AMUSEMENT PARKS AND INDUSTRIES 0.0 Active 11/08/2001 - U92419MH2006NPL160614 MAHARASHTRA TENPIN BOWLING ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 21/03/2006 - U99999MH1990GAT056560 INDO-VIETNAMESE CHAMBER OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY 624500.0 Active 15/09/2014 - U99999MH1997NPL111379 BOWLING AND BILLIARDS ASSOCIATION OF INDIA 0.0 Active 20/10/1997 - -
Associated with Directors