AJAY AGARWAL
-
About AJAY AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01400GJ2010PTC060507 FERRO AGRO PARK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/04/2010 - U17110MH2005PLC190937 SHUBHALAKSHMI POLYESTERS LIMITED 501487030.0 Active 13/09/2005 - U17119GJ1991PTC014906 SHUBHLAXMI DYETEX PVT LTD 295244900.0 Active 16/01/1991 - U17297GJ1987PLC009689 SHUBHALAKSHMI INDUSTRIES LIMITED 13700000.0 Amalgamated 01/06/1987 - U40104DL2010PTC201381 DAHEJ ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 12570000.0 Active 09/04/2010 - U40106DL2008PTC224786 SUNKON ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 109840200.0 Active 13/02/2010 - U45201GJ2001PTC039777 R.B.A PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 15400000.0 Active 01/03/2008 - U65923DD1992SGC001221 OMNIBUS INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF DAMAN DIU AND DADRA NAGARHAVELI LIMITED 260655700.0 Active 14/06/2016 - -
Associated with Directors