AKSHAY GAUR
-
About AKSHAY GAUR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24233MP2001PTC014727 ARYAVARTH HERBALS PRIVATE LIMITED 10602000.0 Active 10/07/2001 - U65910DL1996PLC075110 PEETHAMBRA BUILDCON LIMITED 4950000.0 Active 08/03/2005 - U74899DL1989PLC037359 PEETHAMBRA AYURVED BHAWAN LIMITED 14702200.0 Active 24/12/2004 - U74899DL1995PTC071831 R A ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 7530200.0 Active 30/07/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
ANURADHA SHARMA Director ABHINAV GAUR Director ANIRUDH GAUR Director