ASHOK KUMAR AGARWALA
-
About ASHOK KUMAR AGARWALA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24299WB1949PLC018070 HOOGHLY INK CO (BOMBAY) LTD 706400.0 Active 09/01/1981 - U26931WB1917PLC002869 RELIANCE FIREBRICK & POTTERY COMPANY LTD 3793000.0 Active 20/11/1992 - U27103OR1992PLC003128 EAST INDIA MINERALS LTD. 108110000.0 Active 28/11/2015 - U51109WB1931PTC007007 R.V. BRIGGS & CO PVT LTD 340000.0 Active 23/06/1975 - U51109WB1995PTC072599 SELEHIUM TRADING PVT.LTD. 1016500.0 Active 25/02/2005 - U51909WB1996PTC079203 PHILO SALES PVT LTD 2432000.0 Active 07/06/2004 - U55204WB2009PTC135626 BROWN BROTHERS ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/06/2009 - U67120WB1996PTC078388 BOWMAN FISCAL SERVICES PVT LTD 2384000.0 Active 07/06/2004 - -
Associated with Directors