ANTONIO FRANCISCO COSTA PINTO
-
About ANTONIO FRANCISCO COSTA PINTO,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U26921GA1991PTC001168 VMSALGAOCAR CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 10500000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - U35111GA1965PTC000048 V.M.SALGAOCAR AND BROTHER PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 23/05/2014 - U40109GA2003PLC003362 RELIANCE SALGAOCAR ENERGY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 10/01/2013 - U51900MH1984PTC032096 CHANDRAGUPTA TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 11071110.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U51900MH1989PTC052092 CYRIL TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 48284440.0 Active 25/03/2015 - U51900MH1989PTC052093 KANAKDHARA TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 51724440.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U51900MH1999PTC123374 SAPCOM TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/03/2015 - U51900MH2000PTC129216 RHYME COMMERCIALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/03/2015 - U55101GA2009PTC006089 VMSALGAOCAR HOTELS AND RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - U65944MH1993PTC072891 CALAMA LEASING AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Amalgamated 03/07/2009 - U65990MH1981PTC024526 RADIANT TEXFAB PRIVATE LIMITED 945000.0 Active 28/03/2015 - U65993GA1982PTC000476 BITUBAB REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/1988 - U67120GA1993PTC001413 TERRAQUEO REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 26/03/2015 - U70101GA1990PTC001027 PURATAN REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - U70101GA1994PTC001735 LAGUNA REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/03/2015 - U70101GA2005PTC004099 DIVINE SPRING REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 420000.0 Active 25/03/2015 - U70101GA2009PTC006091 VMSALGAOCAR REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - U70102MH1988PTC048639 ISHETA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 2294000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U70102MH1988PTC049109 SHINY REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 2083330.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U72900MH2001PTC131431 PANORAMA ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U99999MH1986PTC101466 ADVITIYA FABRICS PRIVATE LIMITED 44900000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors