ASHOK KUMAR JAIN
-
About ASHOK KUMAR JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24241UP1986PLC008344 PEE CEE COSMA SOPE LIMITED 26462500.0 Active 10/11/1986 - U00063DL1989PLC137277 PEE CEE HOUSING AND CONSTRUCTIONS LIMITED TFR.FROM UP TO DELHI 48900000.0 Amalgamated 13/09/1989 - U45200DL2010PTC207307 MAYA REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Converted to LLP 19/08/2010 - U45200DL2011PTC217962 LUCERNE CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 07/03/2012 - U45200DL2011PTC229218 PADAM HOUSING AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/12/2011 - U45400DL2007PTC164807 PEE CEE RAJ DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 105000.0 Active 15/06/2007 - U70101DL2005PTC137661 AGRA LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/01/2006 - U70102UP2010PTC041979 PEE CEE REALTY BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 141720.0 Active 14/09/2010 - U70102UP2010PTC042525 MAYA INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 122340.0 Active 09/11/2010 - U74899DL1993PTC052782 JAI GOPAL INVESTMENT AND TRADING CO. PRIVATE LIMITED 1170000.0 Active 14/07/2003 - -
Associated with Directors