SEKHEENA ABOO THAHIR
-
About SEKHEENA ABOO THAHIR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13100TN2003PTC052143 TRANSWORLD MINING INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 800200.0 Active 12/12/2003 - U15127KL2000PTC013793 AGHIN AGRO FOOD INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 27/03/2000 - U24297TN2005PTC056421 THAI ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/05/2005 - U27105KL1996PTC010262 NAKO TILES PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 04/04/1996 - U45200KL2011PTC029494 EON PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 11000000.0 Active 03/10/2011 - U51909KL2002PTC015553 THAI IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 31000000.0 Active 29/07/2002 - U51909TN1993PTC026091 ASHIQUE EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 19000000.0 Active 26/10/1993 - U70100KL2013PTC034358 EON HOME FURNISHING MALL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/06/2013 - U70102KL1997PTC011854 AGHIN DEVELOPERS AND PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/10/1997 - U80301KL2007PTC021151 THAI EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/08/2007 -