ASHOK KUMAR GULIANI
-
About ASHOK KUMAR GULIANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201DL2005PTC143031 RADIANCE INFRACON AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/09/2007 - U74899DL1976PTC008344 SKYLINE INTERNATIONAL SERVICES(PVT)LTD 4500000.0 Active 31/07/1981 - U74899DL1987PTC026575 ELEGANT APARTMENTS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 05/01/1987 - U74899DL1991PTC042726 SKYLINE ENGINEERING CONTRACTS (INDIA) PVT LIMITED 49500000.0 Active 15/01/1991 - U74899DL1994PTC060264 VAIBHAV SEC.INVEST AND REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/07/1994 - U74899DL1994PTC060909 ELEGANT REALTORS AND EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/08/1994 - U74899DL1994PTC062210 S.S. REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 21/07/1997 - -
Associated with Directors
VARUN ASHOK GULIANI Director VINITA GULIANI Director NARENDRA AMRUTLAL SAVLA Director