AKELLA SRINIVAS RAO
-
About AKELLA SRINIVAS RAO,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U28112WB2010NPL142678 ANJALI FOUNDATION 26050000.0 Active 25/02/2010 - U51109WB1996PTC077922 MIDELEC MARKETING PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 14/01/2000 - U51109WB1996PTC078156 LUPIN AGENCIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 01/11/2002 - U74140WB1981PTC033980 MAC CONSULTANTS PVT LTD 400000.0 Active 04/06/2001 -