ARJUN SUSHILKUMAR HANDA
-
About ARJUN SUSHILKUMAR HANDA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L85110GJ1994PLC022543 CLARIS LIFESCIENCES LIMITED 545677650.0 Active 26/09/2014 - U24239GJ2011PLC065289 DORIZOE LIFESCIENCES LIMITED 617290.0 Active 15/06/2017 - U29248GJ2012PTC072919 MEJOR METFAB AND EQUIPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 01/04/2017 - U51397GJ2013PTC076030 BELLISSIMO ENTERPRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Amalgamated 15/07/2013 - U51909GJ2013PTC075961 ATHANAS ENTERPRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 09/07/2013 - U65910GJ1996PTC030641 SARJAN FINANCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 26/03/2005 - U70102GJ2012PTC069220 CLARIS HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/02/2012 - U72900GJ2000PLC038445 ACCELARIS TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 500000.0 Amalgamated 28/02/2009 - -
Associated with Directors