ASHOK KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About ASHOK KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201RJ2006PTC023344 GANPATI PARADISE BUILDHOME PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 21/11/2006 - U45201RJ2007PTC024977 SHIVLING BUILDESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/09/2007 - U45201RJ2007PTC025009 GANPATI LANDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/09/2007 - U70101RJ2009PTC029536 SHIVGYAN PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/08/2009 - U70101RJ2009PTC030090 INDEX REALESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/10/2009 - U70101RJ2010PTC031269 REVERENCE BUILDHOME PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/03/2010 - U70101RJ2010PTC031275 DHANLAXMI BUILDESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/03/2010 - U70101RJ2010PTC032205 SHREE DHAM BUILDESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/06/2010 - U70101RJ2011PTC036632 PARWAL LANDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/08/2012 - U74900RJ2007PTC023853 SHIVGYAN BUILDHOME PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/02/2007 - U74999RJ1999PTC015816 GANESH BUILDESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 6000000.0 Active 14/09/2005 - U74999RJ2006PTC023303 SPECIALITY BUILDHOME PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/11/2006 - U74999RJ2010PTC032481 TULIP LANDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/07/2010 -