AJEET SINGH KARAN
-
About AJEET SINGH KARAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L85110KA1987PLC008739 SHILPA MEDICARE LIMITED 81526898.0 Active 28/01/2011 - U24230MH1971PLC015134 BHARAT SERUMS AND VACCINES LIMITED 93674565.0 Active 01/10/2014 - U40101TN2005PTC058237 AURO MIRA ENERGY COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 11132650.0 Active 27/08/2009 - U67190DL2005PTC142001 ACE WEALTH MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/10/2005 - U72200TN2003PTC051138 SECOVA ESERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 124208730.0 Active 01/08/2009 - U80900KA2013NPL069021 KAUSHALYA VIKAS KENDRA 435000.0 Active 09/05/2013 - -
Associated with Directors