ASHOK KUMAR GARG
-
About ASHOK KUMAR GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22100UP2010PTC039489 LIVROS PUBLISHING PRIVATE LIMITED 1700000.0 Converted to LLP 08/02/2010 - U45200DL2011PTC229233 RENUKA INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 800000.0 Active 10/10/2012 - U45200UP2007PTC032830 A.S. SHELTER PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 12/02/2007 - U45200UP2007PTC032841 AGM COLONISERS & DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 13/02/2007 - U45203DL2011PTC228615 RENUKA VASTUSHILP PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/01/2012 - U45203UP1988PTC009363 SRISHTILAND AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 714000.0 Active 22/02/1988 - U45400DL2011PTC228583 RENUKA REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 15/12/2011 - U45400DL2011PTC229172 RENUKA REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/07/2013 - U70102DL2008PTC182967 VIVISU DEVELOPERS PRIVTE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/07/2010 - U74999UP2016NPL083697 NAVURJA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 31/05/2016 - U92199UP2001PTC026126 ROYALE CLUBS OF INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 10/07/2001 -