ANKIT AGARWAL
-
About ANKIT AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2010PTC152006 MITTAL NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 444000.0 Active 06/08/2010 - U51909GJ2017PTC100254 EMERITUS PHARMA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/12/2017 - U51909WB2012PTC186653 AFTERLINK EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC186654 DHANGANGA COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC186655 RASHIAMRIT TREXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 01/10/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC186656 RITUDHAN DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 01/10/2012 - U52390WB2009PTC139896 LIMELIGHT MERCHANDISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/08/2013 - U52390WB2009PTC139901 EKDANTA MERCHANDISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/08/2013 - U52390WB2009PTC139942 FLAME SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/08/2013 - U52399WB2009PTC139983 OMNI COMMODEAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/08/2013 - U65999WB1992PTC056498 PARASHRAM FINANCE & NIRMAN PVT. LTD. 894300.0 Active 31/03/2002 - U70109WB2012PTC185932 ALLMOST CONCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC185936 BHAVSAGAR NIKETAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC185937 BLUELAND RESIDENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC185940 BOSSLIFE PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC185943 KOTIRATAN NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC186078 MAKELIFE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC186079 DREAMLIGHT TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC186080 MOONLIFE HIGHRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 15/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC186081 SIDHIDHAN REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 15/09/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC186082 SWARANMAHAL PLAZZA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 15/09/2012 - -
Associated with Directors