ACHHRU RAM SHARMA
-
About ACHHRU RAM SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15142PB1992PLC012726 RICELA HEALTH FOODS LIMITED 12375000.0 Active 13/11/1992 - U15143PB1998PLC021323 A P ORGANICS LIMITED 8300000.0 Active 08/08/2012 - U24299PB1983PTC005639 AAR KAY CHEMICALS PVT LTD 7908100.0 Active 16/08/2012 - U25209DL1996NPL078182 THE CENTRAL ORGANISATION FOR OIL INDUSTRY AND TRADE 0.0 Active 22/09/2006 - U91110MH1971NPL015233 THE SOLVENT EXTRACTORS ASSOCIATION OF INDIA 0.0 Active 22/09/2006 - -
Associated with Directors