ANU JINDAL
-
About ANU JINDAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U36102DL2005PTC144047 MARINER FURNITURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/12/2005 - U45201DL2005PTC132820 SASISHNU PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/10/2005 - U51909DL2006PTC147153 JINDAL ART GALLERY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/03/2006 - U65910DL1997PTC085166 GOLDEN AGE CAPLEAFIN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/08/2017 - U70102DL2015PTC276639 GLOCAL REALORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/02/2015 - U70109DL2015PTC276195 INDOWORLD BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/02/2015 - U74899DL1992PTC046955 JINDAL ART GLASS INNOVATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 124600.0 Active 01/09/2003 - -
Associated with Directors
JAI PERKASH JINDAL Director ADITI DHRUV GUPTA Director