AJAY DILKUSH SARUPRIA
-
About AJAY DILKUSH SARUPRIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L72200MH1995PLC176087 INTELLVISIONS SOFTWARE LIMITED 114100000.0 Amalgamated 05/04/2000 - L74899MH1994PLC216417 TRC FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED 50009000.0 Active 15/11/2008 - U21000MH2006PTC161216 K D CONE INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 3880000.0 Active 19/04/2006 - U45201MH1995PTC094583 SILGO PROPERTIES AND INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 17/11/1999 - U51109WB2005PTC101267 DIVYAM TIE UP PRIVATE LIMITED 4280000.0 Converted to LLP 01/12/2007 - U65999MH2009PTC189316 SAM FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 39260000.0 Converted to LLP 07/02/2012 - U67190MH1994PTC080179 SILGO FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Amalgamated 03/11/1999 - U99999MH1997PTC106671 DEEKAY FINEX AND TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED 2630000.0 Amalgamated 18/10/2002 - -
Associated with Directors