ASHOK KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About ASHOK KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U20299DL2003PTC123486 EVERGREEN VENEERS PRIVATE LIMITED 56940000.0 Active 11/12/2003 - U36109DL2003PTC119261 GREEN INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 5847420.0 Active 15/03/2003 - U40107WB2008PTC126621 BERRY ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 5934000.0 Active 16/06/2008 - U65992WB1999PTC145017 EVERGREEN STAINLESS PRIVATE LIMITED 6994200.0 Active 02/02/2008 - U70200DL2011PTC212099 BERRY PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 36060660.0 Active 03/01/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
VIJAY GUPTA Director LEKHRAM GOEL Director RAMESH AGRAWAL CHANDRA Director