AJAY KUMAR DHAGAT
-
About AJAY KUMAR DHAGAT,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L31200TN1975PLC006966 S & S POWER SWITCHGEAR LIMITED 62000000.0 Active 04/06/2015 - U24110MH1996PTC095899 MPM PRIVATE LIMITED 32069010.0 Active 05/04/2017 - U31102AP1984PLC005165 AMARA RAJA POWER SYSTEMS LIMITED 93370840.0 Active 05/11/2013 - U52609TG1966PLC001109 DECCAN ENTERPRISES LTD 30000000.0 Active 24/08/2017 - -
Associated with Directors