ANUJ RAJINDER MIGLANI
-
About ANUJ RAJINDER MIGLANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27104MH1985PLC035806 UTTAM GALVA STEELS LIMITED 1422601030.0 Active 28/07/2010 - L63022WB1982PLC035111 SPIRAL PACK (INDIA) LTD 2100000.0 Active 25/03/2015 - U27104MH2002PLC135119 UTTAM UTKAL STEELS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 11/03/2002 - U27200HR2007PLC037927 UTTAM GALVA METALLICS LIMITED 11681111200.0 Active 13/09/2007 - U29248HR1981PLC050320 METALLURGICAL ENGINEERING AND EQUIPMENTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 26/03/2003 - U45202HR2008PTC049526 REVIVE BUILDZONE AND DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2009 - U45303MH2008PTC186794 SHRINATHJI BIOTECHNOLOGY PARK INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/09/2008 - U51900HR1984PLC048132 KREDENCE MULTI TRADING LIMITED 21050720.0 Active 06/07/2010 - U51900MH1989PTC051001 KARISHMA TRADING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 3906300.0 Active 13/10/2001 - U65990MH1988PLC212607 SHREE UTTAM STEEL AND POWER LIMITED 1593483.0 Amalgamated 10/02/2006 - U74899DL1990PTC039733 MKR ASSOCIATES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 25/11/2009 - U74899DL1994PTC061749 SWILKEN INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 1152000.0 Active 25/11/2009 - -
Associated with Directors